FL H0999 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides personal property exemptions from legal process for medical debts; requires licensed facility to provide cost estimate to patient under certain conditions; prohibits facility from charging patient amount exceeding cost estimate by set threshold; requires facility to provide patient written explanation of excess charges; requires facility to establish internal grievance process to allow patients to dispute charges; prohibits facility from engaging in certain collection activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Billing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#162 (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-24SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2019-04-23SenateIn Messages
2019-04-17HouseCS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 1
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-10HouseCS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-04-10HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-09HouseCS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-04-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/09/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-04-02HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-04-02HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-03-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/02/19, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-07HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-07HouseFavorable by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1
2019-03-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 03/07/19, 9:00 am, Mashburn Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1514 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22226Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3953011Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback