FL S1500 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a refund of the aviation fuel tax collected on aviation fuel purchased by certain commercial airlines in the state capital under certain circumstances. Specifies criteria. Provides for application of certain refund administration procedures. Prohibits application in certain municipalities. Prohibits implementation from reducing or otherwise adversely affecting certain aviation grants.
Title
Capital City Aviation Fuel Tax Act [WPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Finance and Tax | |
2010-04-08 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/13/10, 2:45 pm, 301-S --Temporarily postponed | |
2010-03-18 | Now in Finance and Tax -SJ 00269 | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 -SJ 00269 | |
2010-03-12 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/17/10, 1:00 pm, 37-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Transportation; Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00106 | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Transportation; Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-01-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0931 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council