FL S1494 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 351
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring pharmacists to inform customers of less expensive, generically equivalent drugs for their prescriptions and as to whether customers' cost-sharing obligations exceed the retail price of their prescriptions; requiring a pharmacy benefit manager to register with the Office of Insurance Regulation beginning on a specified date, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drug Pricing Transparency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 351
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 351
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-05SenateCS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-05SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-03-02SenateCS/CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-26SenateCS/CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2018-02-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-02-22SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-21SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-20SenateCS/CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-02-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/20/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-02-08SenateNow in Banking and Insurance
2018-02-07SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2018-02-07SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-06SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/06/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations
2018-01-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H351 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-91

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4650244Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4651862Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62449Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624490Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62764741Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276572Amended CodeSee Bill Text
641314Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback