FL S1494 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring insureds and claimants, or persons acting on their behalf, to provide an insurer with written notice of loss as a condition precedent to bringing a statutory or common-law action for a third-party bad faith action for failure to settle an insurance claim; providing that an insurer is not liable for such claim if certain conditions are met, etc.
Title
Civil Remedies Against Insurers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2014-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/01/14, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0187 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1494 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1494/BillText/Filed/HTML |