FL S1488 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for certain identifying and location information of current members of the Legislature and the spouses and children of such legislators; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption under the Open Government Sunset Review Act; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Members of the Legislature
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Ethics and Elections (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Ethics and Elections (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 2 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2021-04-01 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 1 |
2021-03-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/31/21, 8:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 5 NAYS 4 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/16/21, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1207 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in State Affairs Committee