FL S1416 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7091 (Ch. 2019-35), HB 7097 (Ch. 2019-36)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that certain information related to agency contracts is not confidential or exempt from public records requirements; deleting a provision exempting trade secrets held by local government agencies from public records requirements; repealing a provision relating to a public records exemption under the Florida Accidental Release Prevention and Risk Management Planning Act, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7091 (Ch. 2019-35), HB 7097 (Ch. 2019-36)
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-02SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
2019-03-27SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2019-03-26SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-25SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/25/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-02-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1414 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H759 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7091 (Ch. 2019-35), HB 7097 (Ch. 2019-36)
H761 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
S7052 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7097 (Ch. 2019-36)
S7054 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7091 (Ch. 2019-35)
H7091 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-35
H7097 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-36

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100422Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100430Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100443Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10044472Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100478Amended CodeSee Bill Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1190713Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11907135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1250104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
202195Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2154401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25288Amended CodeSee Bill Text
252943Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2870943Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288047Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2881226Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288776Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889520Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889626Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889627Amended CodeSee Bill Text
331326Amended CodeSee Bill Text
334049Amended CodeSee Bill Text
350121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
364183Amended CodeSee Bill Text
365174Amended CodeSee Bill Text
366093Amended CodeSee Bill Text
367156Amended CodeSee Bill Text
368108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38183Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3953035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4037046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40373Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408910Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40991196Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49400125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497172Amended CodeSee Bill Text
499012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4990121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
499051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
499931Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
502222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5172015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5209965Amended CodeSee Bill Text
526311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
548062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
556113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5595558Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5599285Amended CodeSee Bill Text
560129Amended CodeSee Bill Text
57048Amended CodeSee Bill Text
570544Amended CodeSee Bill Text
573123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
581199Amended CodeSee Bill Text
60110Amended CodeSee Bill Text
60115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
601152Amended CodeSee Bill Text
60176Amended CodeSee Bill Text
60180Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6070505Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6170503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6244212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6244213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62684195Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626884Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6269936Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6270628Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6273518Amended CodeSee Bill Text
655057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6550591Amended CodeSee Bill Text
663533Amended CodeSee Bill Text
721071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
72113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
730155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81504Amended CodeSee Bill Text
815045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback