FL S1414 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for trade secrets held by an agency; providing that an agency employee is not liable for the release of records in compliance with the act; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Trade Secrets Held by an Agency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-02 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/25/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1416 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7091 (Ch. 2019-35), HB 7097 (Ch. 2019-36)
H761 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
H759 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7091 (Ch. 2019-35), HB 7097 (Ch. 2019-36)
H761 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
H759 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7091 (Ch. 2019-35), HB 7097 (Ch. 2019-36)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
119 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
688 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
688 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
688 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |