FL S1414 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing fleet companies to purchase specialty license plates in lieu of the standard fleet license plates for additional fees; requiring a dealer or fleet specialty license plate to include the letters "DLR" or "FLT" on the right side of the license plate; establishing an annual use fee for the Highwaymen license plate, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specialty License Plates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-08SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2018-02-07SenateCS by Transportation read 1st time
2018-02-07SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-06SenateCS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/06/18, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2018-01-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H297 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
H671 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
H1359 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S1104 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
H1287 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200657Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008058Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback