FL S1396 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7061
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing certain Supreme Court Justices to have an appropriate facility in their district of residence designated as their official headquarters; adding judges to the Ninth Judicial Circuit Court; requiring sheriffs to provide security for trial court facilities; increasing the limit of the amount in controversy in certain actions at law under which the county court has original jurisdiction of such actions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judicial Branch

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7061
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted CS/HB 7061
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-06SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-03-02SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2018-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-16SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-14SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/14/18, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-30SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2018-01-29SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-01-26SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-25SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2018-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/25/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-12-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H5301 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
S1384 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
H7089 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S248 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
S1218 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H7061 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in returning Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
26031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback