FL S1396 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-16 - Now in Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Adding judges to the Ninth Judicial Circuit Court; adding and removing judges from certain county courts, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judgeships

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-16SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-14SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/14/18, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-30SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2018-01-29SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-01-26SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-25SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2018-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/25/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-12-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H5301 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
S1384 (Similar To) 2018-02-16 - Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
26031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback