FL H7089 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates and revises numerous provisions relating to public safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied on Calendar
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-22HouseFavorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0
2018-02-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/22/18, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2018-02-20HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced
2018-02-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1201 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-104
S226 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S1318 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 1201
S1218 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S1396 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7061

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
57105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
784046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7840485Amended CodeSee Bill Text
794056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
80003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
91416Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93318Amended CodeSee Bill Text
938085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9444731Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9448055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9448065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
948001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
948013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
948081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985441Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback