FL S1374 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Health to designate regional perinatal intensive care centers; providing that designation by the department is required for participation in the regional perinatal intensive care centers program; specifying standards that must be included in department rules relating to the designation, development, and operation of a regional perinatal intensive care center; specifying reimbursement parameters for certain services provided in a regional perinatal intensive care center setting, etc.
Title
Regional Perinatal Intensive Care Centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/28/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/21/20, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H665 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
383 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 975 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1374 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1374/BillText/Filed/HTML |