FL S1348 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the "Children's Promise Act"; requiring a certain organization to provide the Department of Revenue with an annual written certification demonstrating its status as an eligible charitable organization for certain purposes; providing the tax credit cap amount for a specified state fiscal year; authorizing a taxpayer to submit an application to the department requesting certain tax credits; authorizing qualified nonprofit organizations to establish programs to provide temporary respite care for children; providing registration and recordkeeping requirements for such organizations and the Department of Children and Families, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Temporary Care of a Child

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2019-12-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7063 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H7097 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Chapter No. 2020-10

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4091761Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback