FL S1332 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 481
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 481
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting counties from enacting ordinances, regulations, or policies that prevent certain electric utilities from installing temporary underground power panels and from requiring subsequent inspections of such panels as a condition of a certificate of occupancy under specified conditions; defining the term "temporary underground power panel", etc.
Title
Temporary Underground Power Panels
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 481 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 481 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/22 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Retained on Calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2022-02-10 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/08/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-27 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/25/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules |
2021-12-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H481 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Chapter No. 2022-82
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 488 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 0484 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |