FL S1318 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 1201
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a person to seek a declaratory statement from an agency as to the effect of the person's criminal background on his or her eligibility for certain licenses, registrations, or certificates; prohibiting the conviction of a crime before a specified date from being grounds for the denial of a certification under certain circumstances; authorizing the Department of Corrections to contract with certain entities to provide educational services for the Correctional Education Program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensing and Training

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 1201
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted HB 1201
2018-03-08SenateAmendment(s) adopted (780664)
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-03-02SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-01SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-27SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2018-02-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-16SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-14SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/14/18, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-30SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-01-29SenateFavorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-01-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/29/18, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced
2018-01-11SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-12-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1201 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-104
H7089 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H1041 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
S1114 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
S1218 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101180Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101181Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101184Amended CodeSee Bill Text
120565Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
455213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
951176Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback