FL H1041 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 4-2)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Removes regulations on specified DBPR professions; revises certain requirements for certain licensees; requires board to use specified process for review of applicant's criminal record to determine eligibility for certain licenses; prohibits conviction of crime before specified date from being grounds for denial of certain licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional Regulation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#804 (Y: 76 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Regulated Industries
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-06SenateReceived
2018-03-06SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations; Rules
2018-03-05SenateIn Messages
2018-03-05HouseCS passed; YEAS 76 NAYS 36
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time 900
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time 835
2018-02-27HouseCS/CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time 691
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-27HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-27HouseCS/CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 6
2018-02-26HouseCS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time 675
2018-02-26HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/27/18, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2018-02-25HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2018-02-25HouseCS referred to Judiciary Committee
2018-02-23HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-22HouseCS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 8
2018-02-20HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/22/18, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2018-02-14HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2018-02-14HouseFavorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0
2018-02-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/14/18, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2018-02-05HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2018-01-31HouseCS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-31HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-30HouseCS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2018-01-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Careers and Competition Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-03HouseReferred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Commerce Committee
2017-12-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1114 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
H15 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
S526 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
S1318 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 1201

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
120565Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
326004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44702Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44709Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44712Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44716Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
455213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
469006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
469009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4710035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
471005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
471011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
471015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
471017Amended CodeSee Bill Text
471021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
471023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
471033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
471038Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4710385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
476034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
476114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
476144Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477029Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481219Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481229Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481317Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481319Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481329Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489553Amended CodeSee Bill Text
492104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
492111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
492113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
492115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
548003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
548017Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback