FL H0015 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removes regulations on specified DBPR professions, including labor organizations, hair braiders, hair wrappers & body wrappers, & boxing timekeepers & announcers; revises certain requirements for barbers, nail specialists, business organizations that provide architecture services and interior design, landscape architects, & geologists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deregulation of Professions and Occupations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#515 (Y: 74 N: 28 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Regulated Industries
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-31SenateReceived
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations; Rules
2018-01-24SenateIn Messages
2018-01-12HousePassed; YEAS 74 NAYS 28
2018-01-12HouseRead 3rd time 336
2018-01-11HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-01-11HouseRead 2nd time
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/11/18
2017-10-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-10-10HouseFavorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 7
2017-10-03HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 10/10/17, 9:30 am, Webster Hall
2017-09-19HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2017-09-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S526 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
S1114 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
H1041 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
287055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
326004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44702Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44709Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44712Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44716Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
469006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
469009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
476034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
476114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
476144Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477029Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481219Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481229Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481317Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481319Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481329Amended CodeSee Bill Text
492104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
492111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
492113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
492115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
548003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
548017Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback