FL S1288 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Tobacco 21 Act"; revising shipping documentation requirements for specified sales of tobacco products; revising the age limit for smoking near school property; prohibiting certain entities from gifting sample tobacco products to persons under 21 years of age, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tobacco Products

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Regulated Industries
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/14/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Discussed/Workshop
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced
2018-01-11SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2017-12-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1029 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
H797 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
S350 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S994 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
S1270 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
H1095 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
210095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
386212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
569002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
569007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5690075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
569008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
569101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56911Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56912Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56914Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56919Amended CodeSee Bill Text
877112Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback