FL H1095 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises requirements for determination of indigency for payment of certain penalties/fees; revises & repeals provisions relating to driver license suspension/revocation for certain offenses; revises penalties; requires DHSMV to notify DOLRI of adoption of certain forms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Penalties and Fees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Appropriations Committee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-30HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2018-01-30HouseFavorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-01-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-07HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-12-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1270 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
H731 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-134
H1029 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
S350 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S732 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 731
S1288 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100327Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2752Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28246Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316650Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32227Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
562111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56911Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
80613Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8120155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
83209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
877112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93830Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback