FL S1266 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8019 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8019 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing February 14, 2022, and each February 14 thereafter, as "Marjory Stoneman Douglas High School Memorial Day" in Florida, a day of remembrance for all of those who lost their lives, or whose lives were forever changed, as a result of the mass shooting at Marjory Stoneman Douglas High School in Parkland, etc.
Title
Marjory Stoneman Douglas High School Memorial Day
Sponsors
Sen. Lauren Book [D] | Sen. Tina Polsky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8019 (Adopted) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H8019 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Adopted by Publication; companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1266 (Adopted)
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1266 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1266/BillText/Filed/HTML |