FL H8019 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Adopted by Publication; companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1266 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Adopted by Publication; companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1266 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes February 14, 2021, as "Marjory Stoneman Douglas High School Memorial Day" in Florida, a day of remembrance for all of those who lost their lives, or whose lives were forever changed, as result of mass shooting at Marjory Stoneman Douglas High School in Parkland.
Title
Marjory Stoneman Douglas High School Memorial Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Adopted by Publication; companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1266 (Adopted) |
2021-04-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only |
2021-03-17 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1266 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8019 (Adopted)
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/8019 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/8019/BillText/Filed/PDF |