FL S1256 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the terms "beneficial owner" and "legal entity"; removing authorization for a tax collector to require payment of a reasonable deposit from certain persons; providing that any person may register and participate in tax certificate sales; removing provisions related to mailing of certain notices by tax collectors, etc.
Title
Taxation
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H977 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
197 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
197 | 4315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
197 | 432 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1256 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1256/BillText/Filed/HTML |