FL S1252 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2019-89)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the percentage of total hours of accounting-related and auditing-related continuing education required by the Board of Accountancy for license renewal; updating provisions relating to license reactivation; prohibiting a person from performing or offering to perform certain services without a license, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Accountancy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2019-89)
2019-05-02SenateSubstituted CS/HB 977
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/19
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-23SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-04-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-03SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2019-04-03SenateNow in Rules
2019-04-02SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-01SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/01/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-20SenateNow in Banking and Insurance
2019-03-19SenateFavorable by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-03-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 03/19/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2019-02-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H977 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-89

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
473302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
473312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
473313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
473322Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback