FL H0977 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-89
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises percentage of total hours of accounting-related & auditing-related continuing education required by Board of Accountancy for license renewal; updating provisions relating to license reactivation; prohibits person from performing or offering to perform certain services without license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Accountancy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#129 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Chapter No. 2019-89
2019-06-07 Approved by Governor
2019-06-05 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-03HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-03SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-02SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1252
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-02SenateWithdrawn from Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2019-04-24SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2019-04-23SenateIn Messages
2019-04-17HouseCS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-04HouseFavorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2019-04-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/04/19, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2019-03-28HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2019-03-28HouseCS referred to Commerce Committee
2019-03-28HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-27HouseCS by Business and Professions Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-27HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-26HouseCS by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1252 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 977 (Ch. 2019-89)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
473302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
473312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
473313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
473322Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback