FL S1252 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that a medical alert logo may be placed on the face of an identification card or driver license issued to a person with a medical condition; directing the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to require proof of such medical condition, etc.
Title
Identification Cards and Driver Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0393 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1252 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1252/BillText/Filed/HTML |