FL S1240 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "NAICS"; providing a credit against the corporate income tax, for a specified amount and for a specified taxable year, for taxpayers classified in the sales financing or passenger car rental or leasing industries which meet certain criteria, etc.
Title
Corporate Income Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Finance and Tax |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2020-02-06 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/04/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/28/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Not Considered |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7097 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Chapter No. 2020-10