FL S1240 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes an amendment to the State Constitution to assert the sovereignty of the state and refuse to comply with unconstitutional federal mandates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sovereignty of the State [SPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Rules
2010-04-22 Withdrawn from Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00750; Now in Rules
2010-04-20 Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00650
2010-04-19 Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 -SJ 00650
2010-04-16 On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/19/10, 1:00 pm, 110-S
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Judiciary; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00089
2010-02-03 Referred to Judiciary; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules
2010-01-19 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0679 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
00128Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback