FL H0679 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes creation of s. 28, Art. I of State Constitution to assert sovereignty of state & declare right of people of state to refuse to comply with federal mandates that violate U.S. Constitution.
Title
Sovereignty of the State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; Policy Council; Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00062 | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; Policy Council; Rules and Calendar Council | |
2010-01-15 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1240 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Rules