FL S1216 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding the exemption from public records requirements for any information in a videotaped statement of a minor who is alleged to be or who is a victim of sexual battery, lewd acts, or other sexual misconduct; providing for future review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Videotaped Statement of a Minor

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Rules
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-24SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-23SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-01-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-12SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-01-11SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2018-01-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-10SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/10/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-12-18SenateReferred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-12-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1214 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
H7019 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
H7017 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback