FL H7017 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes subpoenas in certain investigations of sexual offenses involving child victims & specifies requirements; prohibits person from using child in sexual performance or promoting sexual performance by child; provides for separate offenses of computer pornography & child exploitation; prohibits person from possessing, with intent to promote, child pornography; prohibits person from knowingly possessing, controlling, or intentionally viewing child pornography; provides for separate offenses of transmission of child pornography.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Exploitation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#628 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-21SenateReceived
2018-02-20SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Criminal Justice; Appropriations; Rules
2018-02-20SenateIn Messages
2018-02-14HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 111 NAYS 0
2018-02-14HouseAmendment(s) adopted (164709, 640357) 589
2018-02-14HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2018-02-14HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-14HouseRead 2nd time 580
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
2018-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-26HouseCS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2018-01-26HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-25HouseCS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-01-23HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/25/18, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-18HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2018-01-18HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/18/18, 1:00 pm, Mashburn Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-11HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-12-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7019 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
S1214 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
S1216 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1012315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012467Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1656Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38429Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390139Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39506Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39001114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
393067Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3949125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3974872Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43504Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456074Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50707Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63089Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63092Amended CodeSee Bill Text
65550Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6807Amended CodeSee Bill Text
741313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
743067Amended CodeSee Bill Text
772102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775082Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775084Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7750847Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7750862Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7750877Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77513Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77524Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77525Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
784046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
784049Amended CodeSee Bill Text
794011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7940115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
794024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
794056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
794075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79410Amended CodeSee Bill Text
796001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
827071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
847001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
847002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
847003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
847012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8470135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
84701357Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8470137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8470138Amended CodeSee Bill Text
856022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
896101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9030351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
903046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90534Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9256Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92561Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92565Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
921141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
938085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93810Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430435Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94304354Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430436Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430585Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943059Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943325Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9434354Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94411Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944606Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944608Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944609Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94470Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94713Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9471405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
947141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
948013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94804Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
948062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
948063Amended CodeSee Bill Text
948064Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94808Amended CodeSee Bill Text
948101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94812Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94830Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94831Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94832Amended CodeSee Bill Text
95127Amended CodeSee Bill Text
960003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
96003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
960065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
960197Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9850301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98504Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985441Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985475Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9854815Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback