FL S1214 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the automatic expunction of criminal history records in specified circumstances. Provides procedures to expunge a criminal history record. Provides for the effect of expunction. Provides that expunction granted under this section does not prevent a person who receives such relief from petitioning for the expunction or sealing of a criminal history record under other provisions of law, etc.
Title
Criminal History Records/Expunction [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Criminal Justice | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00087 | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations | |
2010-01-14 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0541 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0943 | 0582 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 0585 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 0595 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0948 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0948 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0961 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0985 | 345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |