FL S1192 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 831 (Ch. 2019-112)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 831 (Ch. 2019-112)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain health care practitioners to electronically generate and transmit prescriptions for medicinal drugs upon license renewal or by a specified date; revising the definitions of the terms "prescribing decision" and "point of care"; revising the authority for electronic prescribing software to display information regarding a payor's formulary under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Electronic Prescribing
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Health Policy Committee | Sen. Aaron Bean [R] | Sen. Dennis Baxley [R] |
Sen. Darryl Rouson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 831 (Ch. 2019-112) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 831 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-22 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-04-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/16/19, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-04-10 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/08/19, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H831 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-112
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 91196 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 0392 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 3265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 347 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 0137 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
831 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |