FL H0831 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-112
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain health care practitioners to electronically generate and transmit prescriptions for medicinal drugs upon license renewal or by a specified date; authorizing the Department of Health, in consultation with the Board of Medicine, the Board of Osteopathic Medicine, the Board of Podiatric Medicine, the Board of Dentistry, the Board of Nursing, and the Board of Optometry, to adopt rules; revising the authority for electronic prescribing software to display information regarding a payor's formulary under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic Prescribing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#358 (Y: 104 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#73 (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18 Chapter No. 2019-112
2019-06-18 Approved by Governor
2019-06-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-02HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-05-02HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 104 NAYS 8
2019-05-02HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (161690) 1142
2019-05-01HouseIn returning messages
2019-05-01SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-01SenateAmendment(s) adopted (161690)
2019-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-01SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1192
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-01SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Rules
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Health Policy; Rules
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 4
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HouseCS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-03HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-03HouseCS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 2
2019-04-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-27HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-26HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-06HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-05HouseFavorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/05/19, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1192 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 831 (Ch. 2019-112)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40991196Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409912Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4560392Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45642Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45643Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458347Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4590137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
831311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893065Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/831
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/831/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/831/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/831/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/831/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/831/Amendment/790429/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/831/Amendment/932909/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/831/Amendment/161690/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/831/Vote/HouseVote_h00831c1073.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/831/Vote/SenateVote_h00831c1023.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/831/Vote/HouseVote_h00831c1358.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback