FL S1174 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring, rather than authorizing, parties to a property insurance claims dispute to participate in mediation; providing that mediation is a condition precedent to commencing litigation; requiring, rather than authorizing, the Department of Financial Services to adopt certain rules; revising conditions under which a policyholder has a certain timeframe to rescind a settlement, etc.
Title
Resolution of Disputed Property Insurance Claims
Sponsors
Sen. Tina Polsky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1141 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 7015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1174 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1174/BillText/Filed/HTML |