FL S1174 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that a petition for concurrent custody may include certain requests; providing requirements for orders granting concurrent or temporary custody; requiring the court to establish any conditions for the transition of custody of the child to the parent which are in the child's best interest under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Custody of Minor Children by Extended Family

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Rules
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-02SenateNow in Rules
2019-04-01SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-03-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/01/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-21SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2019-03-20SenateNow in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2019-03-20SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-18SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/18/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
2019-02-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H917 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
75101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
75103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
75105Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback