FL S1174 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising notice requirements for enforcement of liens by the owner of the self-service storage facility or self-contained storage unit; specifying a limit on the value of property stored in the tenant's storage unit; authorizing the towing of a vehicle in a storage unit under certain circumstances; limiting the liability of the owner of a self-service storage facility or self-contained storage unit after a vehicle is towed from such facility or unit, etc.
Title
Liens on Personal Property in Self-service Storage Facilities and Self-contained Storage Units
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Ring [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Regulated Industries (417994); YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 04/09/13, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 04/02/13, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Judiciary; Rules |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0727 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Regulated Industries