FL S1142 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 851
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies that occupation and maintenance of property satisfies the requirements for possession for purposes of gaining title to property via adverse possession without color of title. Requires that the property appraiser add certain information related to the adverse possession claim to the parcel information on the tax roll and prescribing conditions for removal of that information. Excludes property subject to adverse possession claims without color of title from provisions authorizing the tax collector not to send a tax notice for minimum tax, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adverse Possession

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-04 Ordered enrolled -SJ 851
2011-05-04 Read 3rd time -HJ 1115
2011-05-03 Read 2nd time -HJ 1034
2011-05-02 Referred to Calendar -HJ 1014
2011-04-06 In Messages
2011-04-06 Read 2nd time -SJ 363
2011-04-04 Placed on Consent Calendar, 04/06/11
2011-04-01 Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 323
2011-03-31 Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 -SJ 323
2011-03-29 On Committee agenda-- Budget, 03/31/11, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2011-03-21 Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 235
2011-03-16 On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/21/11, 10:15 am, 412 Knott Building
2011-03-10 Now in Community Affairs -SJ 185
2011-03-09 Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 185
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 85
2011-03-04 On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/09/11, 3:15 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2011-03-01 Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Budget -SJ 85
2011-02-16 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0918 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
H0927 () 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1142 (Ch.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
197212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1973335Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9518Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback