FL H0927 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1142 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1142 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that occupation & maintenance of property satisfies requirements for possession for purposes of gaining title to property via adverse possession without color of title; requires person seeking property by adverse possession to use uniform adverse possession return provided by DOR; requires property appraiser to notify owner of record of claim; requires person claiming adverse possession to attest to truthfulness of information; requires appraiser to add certain information related to claim to information on tax roll, etc.
Title
Adverse Possession
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1142 (Ch. | |
2011-04-12 | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 618 | |
2011-04-08 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/12/11, 1:00 pm, 404 HOB | |
2011-04-06 | Now in Judiciary Committee -HJ 453 | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 -HJ 453 | |
2011-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 04/05/11, 11:45 am, Morris Hall | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 273 | |
2011-03-17 | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/21/11, 4:00 pm, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 80 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 80 | |
2011-02-22 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0918 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S1142 () 2011-05-04 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 851
S1142 () 2011-05-04 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 851
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
197 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
197 | 3335 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
95 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/927 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0927/BillText/Filed/HTML |