FL S0918 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that occupation and maintenance of property satisfies requirements for possession for purposes of gaining title to property via adverse possession without color of title. Requires that the property appraiser add certain information related to the adverse possession claim to the parcel information on the tax roll and prescribing conditions for removal of that information. Excludes property subject to adverse possession claims without color of title from provisions authorizing the tax collector not to send a tax notice for minimum tax bills, etc.
Title
Adverse Possession
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 71 | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Budget -SJ 71 | |
2011-02-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1142 () 2011-05-04 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 851
H0927 () 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1142 (Ch.
H0927 () 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1142 (Ch.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
197 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
197 | 3335 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
95 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/918 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0918/BillText/Filed/HTML |