FL S1132 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that a specified value be used for each student who fulfills specified requirements in the calculation of full-time equivalent student membership, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funds for Operation of Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-09SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/09/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-26SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-03-26SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 03/26/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-02-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H989 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee
H1061 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
S1388 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101162Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback