FL H1061 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises annual allocation to school districts to include additional calculation of full-time equivalent membership for students who earn College Board Advanced Placement Capstone Diploma beginning in specific fiscal year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funds for the Operation of Schools

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#245 (Y: 107 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Education
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateIn Messages
2019-04-25HouseCS passed; YEAS 107 NAYS 4
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19
2019-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-16HouseFavorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-04-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/16/19, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall
2019-04-04HouseNow in Education Committee
2019-04-04HouseCS referred to Education Committee
2019-04-04HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Appropriations Committee
2019-04-03HouseCS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-04-03HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-01HouseCS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2019-03-28HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/01/19, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseReferred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee; Appropriations Committee
2019-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H989 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee
S1132 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
S1388 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101162Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback