FL S1128 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that an individual with a disability who has an emotional support animal or obtains an emotional support animal is entitled to full and equal access to all housing accommodations; prohibiting a housing accommodation from requiring such individual to pay extra compensation for such animal; specifying that an individual with a disability is liable for certain damage done by her or his emotional support animal, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emotional Support Animals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied on Calendar
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-24SenateTemporarily postponed on 2nd reading; On Unfinished Business
2019-04-24SenateAmendment(s) adopted (131058)
2019-04-24SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
2019-04-16SenateCS by Rules read 1st time
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-10SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-10SenateCS by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-04-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/10/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-26SenateNow in Rules
2019-03-26SenateFavorable by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 03/26/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-12SenateNow in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
2019-03-11SenateFavorable by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/11/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Agriculture; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules
2019-02-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H721 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41308Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback