FL H0721 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that individual with disability who has emotional support animal is entitled to access to housing accommodation; prohibits housing accommodation from requiring such individual to pay extra compensation; authorizes housing accommodation to request written documentation verifying individual's disability or disability-related need; specifies individual is liable for damage done by emotional support animal; prohibits falsification of written documentation or other misrepresentation; provides penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emotional Support Animals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied on Calendar
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-17HouseCS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2019-04-17HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-16HouseCS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-04-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/16/19, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-26HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-03-25HouseFavorable by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-03-21HouseOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 03/25/19, 4:00 pm, 12 HOB
2019-03-20HouseNow in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
2019-03-20HouseFavorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-03-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/20/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-02-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1128 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41308Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback