FL S1122 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Historic Florida Monuments and Memorials Protection Act"; preempting regulation of specified monuments and memorials to the state; prohibiting persons and specified entities from taking certain actions relating to historic monuments and memorials on public property; requiring courts to declare certain ordinances, regulations, and rules of a local government to be invalid and issue permanent injunctions against the local government; providing civil penalties for certain officials who engage in certain actions; prohibiting the use of public funds to defend or reimburse unlawful conduct of certain persons, etc.
Title
Protection of Historic Monuments and Memorials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-08 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 401 Senate Building |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 2 |
2024-01-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy |
2023-12-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H395 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee