FL H0395 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits certain acts concerning historic monuments & memorials on public property; provides for standing to bring civil actions; provides civil penalties for officials who engage in certain actions; provides local government is liable in certain instances; requires state to restore or relocate monument or memorial in certain circumstances; prohibits distribution of funding to local governments until they reimburse state; authorizes removal or temporary relocation of monument or memorial in certain instances provided certain requirements are met; specifies certain duties of Division of Historical Resources & Department of Veterans' Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protection of Historic Monuments and Memorials

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-30 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-08HouseDied in Appropriations Committee
2024-02-01HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2024-02-01HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2024-02-01HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2024-01-31House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2024-01-31HouseCS Filed
2024-01-31HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2024-01-31HouseReported out of State Affairs Committee
2024-01-30HouseFavorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
2024-01-26HousePCS added to State Affairs Committee agenda
2024-01-09House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-11-22HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2023-11-22HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2023-11-22HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2023-11-22HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2023-11-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1122 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
267201Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback