FL S1120 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting public school employees from using corporal punishment on a public school student; removing corporal punishment as an option for teachers and other instructional personnel to use to manage student behavior, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporal Punishment in Public Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Judiciary
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-26SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-03-26SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 2
2019-03-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 03/26/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Education; Judiciary; Rules
2019-02-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1361 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10023105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100242Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100243Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100326Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100332Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100352Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10122315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101228Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4141251Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback