FL S1106 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating a uniform annual use fee collected for a specialty license plate unless otherwise specified; adding annual use fees for certain specialty license plates, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fees/Specialty License Plates Uniform Annual Use Fee

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-17SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/16/19, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-04SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2019-04-04SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2019-04-04SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-02SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-03-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 04/02/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-02-15SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1104 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
H505 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H201 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32008056Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback