FL S1102 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a jail's staff to screen each defendant booked into a jail on misdemeanor charges using a certain instrument to determine if there is an indication of a mental health disorder; requiring an authorized professional completing a certain evaluation to issue a professional certificate if an evaluation of the defendant demonstrates that the defendant appears to meet the criteria for involuntary examination under the Baker Act, etc.
Title
Defendants With Mental Illness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/25/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1005 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
916 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1102 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1102/BillText/Filed/HTML |