FL S1098 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that for purposes of resolving an impasse the sheriff, the tax collector, the property appraiser, the supervisor of elections, and the clerk of the circuit court are each deemed the "legislative body" for their respective employees. Provides that in a county that has expressly abolished the office of any constitutional officer, such duties are transferred to the officer as provided for under the county charter if the charter is not inconsistent with general law or a special law approved by a vote of the electors.
Title
Collective Bargaining For Certain Public Employees
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Hays [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 -SJ 235 | |
2011-03-16 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/21/11, 10:15 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 81 | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 81 | |
2011-02-15 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1031 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1098 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1098/BillText/Filed/HTML |