FL H1031 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that for purposes of resolving impasse sheriff, tax collector, property appraiser, supervisor of elections, & clerk of circuit court are each deemed "legislative body" for their respective employees; provides that in county that has expressly abolished office of any constitutional officer, such duties are transferred to officer as provided for under county charter if charter is not inconsistent with general law or special law approved by vote of electors.
Title
Collective Bargaining for Certain Public Employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 90 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 90 | |
2011-02-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1098 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1031 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1031/BillText/Filed/HTML |